Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Sanguin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senlis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornParis
10 Mar 162242.1SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
19 Sep 162242.7ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
12 Feb 162343.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
1651¹71.0ResignedBishop of Senlis, France
15 Jul 165373.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Senlis, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Sanguin:
Bishop Nicolas Sanguin (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senlis

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015