Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Mathias, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1887BornParis, France
20 Jul 191326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Dec 192235.4AppointedPrefect of Assam, India
9 Jul 193447.0AppointedBishop of Shillong, India
10 Nov 193447.3Ordained BishopBishop of Shillong, India
25 Mar 193547.7AppointedArchbishop of Madras, India
13 Nov 195265.3AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
3 Aug 196578.0DiedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for Louis Mathias:
Archbishop Louis Mathias S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013