Catholic-Hierarchy DC

César-Guillaume Cardinal de la Luzerne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1738BornParis
27 Mar 176223.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 177032.0SelectedBishop of Langres, France
10 Sep 177032.2ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
30 Sep 177032.2Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
27 Jan 180263.6ResignedBishop of Langres, France
28 Jul 181779.1Elevated to Cardinal
9 Sep 181779.2SelectedBishop of Langres, France
1 Oct 181779.2ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
21 Jun 182183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Langres, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for César-Guillaume de la Luzerne:
Cardinal César-Guillaume de la Luzerne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Langres

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Jul 1817
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013