Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinand-Maximilien-Mériadec de Rohan-Guéménée

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1738BornParis
26 Dec 176931.1SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
12 Mar 177031.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
8 Apr 177031.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
28 Jan 178142.2SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
30 Mar 178142.3ResignedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
2 Apr 178142.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
23 Nov 180163.0ResignedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
31 Oct 181374.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand-Maximilien-Mériadec de Rohan-Guéménée
Archbishop Ferdinand-Maximilien-Mériadec de Rohan-Guéménée (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134, and Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016