Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Laurent Bernard Marie Ulrich

Archbishop of Lille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1951 BornDijon
2 Dec 197928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dijon, France
6 Jun 200048.7AppointedArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
10 Sep 200049.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
1 Feb 200856.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lille, France
30 Mar 200856.6AppointedArchbishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Bernard Marie Ulrich:
Archbishop Laurent Bernard Marie Ulrich (born ) Archbishop of Lille

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2008
  • elev: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,835
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013