Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Bourlon (Bourbon)

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornParis
28 Aug 165140.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Soissons, France
16 Dec 165241.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Soissons, France
16 Dec 165241.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
2 Feb 165342.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
28 Oct 165645.8SucceededBishop of Soissons, France
26 Oct 168574.8DiedBishop of Soissons, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bourlon (Bourbon):
Bishop Charles de Bourlon (Bourbon) (died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015