Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Charles du Camboust de Coislin

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1664³Born
18 Jul 169429.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 169732.7SelectedBishop of Metz, France
11 Nov 169733.1ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
22 Dec 169733.2Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
17 Feb 169833.4InstalledBishop of Metz, France
28 Nov 173268.2DiedBishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Charles du Camboust de Coislin
Bishop Henri-Charles du Camboust de Coislin (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018