Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Apolinaire de La Tour du Pin-Montauban

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1741BornParis
10 Aug 177736.5SelectedBishop of Nancy, France
15 Dec 177736.9ConfirmedBishop of Nancy, France
25 Jan 177837.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy, France
15 Jun 178342.4SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
15 Jul 178342.5ResignedBishop of Nancy, France
18 Jul 178342.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
24 Oct 180160.7ResignedArchbishop of Auch, France
17 Oct 180261.7SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Troyes, France
20 Dec 180261.9ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
28 Nov 180766.8DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Apolinaire de La Tour du Pin-Montauban:
Archbishop Louis-Apolinaire de La Tour du Pin-Montauban (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a bishop for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 375
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 110, and Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016