Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jérôme Daniel Beau

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1957 Born
23 Oct 198325.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
23 Jun 198426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
1 Jun 200648.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
1 Jun 200648.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Privata
8 Sep 200648.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Privata
25 Jul 201860.5AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
23 Sep 201860.7InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Daniel Beau (VIAF: 88203534)
Archbishop Jérôme Daniel Beau (born ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSaint-Vincent de Paul, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bourges.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,236
  • od: AJ, 25 May 2018
  • c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2018
  • i: AJ, 26 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast