Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-François Moreau

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1721BornParis
3 Dec 175837.1SelectedBishop of Vence, France
4 Apr 175937.5ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
29 Apr 175937.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
27 Nov 176342.1SelectedBishop of Mâcon, France
18 Feb 176442.4ResignedBishop of Vence, France
9 Apr 176442.5ConfirmedBishop of Mâcon, France
26 Sep 180180.0RetiredBishop of Mâcon, France
9 Apr 180280.5SelectedBishop of Autun, France
16 May 180280.6ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
8 Sep 180280.9DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-François Moreau
Bishop Gabriel-François Moreau (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a bishop for 43.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 60
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281, and Page 434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016