Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jules Baron

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1838Born
21 Dec 186123.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189657.8SelectedBishop of Angers, France
25 Jun 189657.8ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
24 Aug 189658.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
28 May 189859.8DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jules Baron (VIAF: 199117538)
Bishop Louis-Jules Baron (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaugrigneuse, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopN.D. des Champs, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017