Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anne-Antoine-Jules Cardinal de Clermont-Tonnerre

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1749BornParis
23 Dec 178133.0SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
25 Feb 178233.1ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
14 Apr 178233.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
15 Dec 180153.0ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
1 Jul 182071.5SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
28 Aug 182071.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
2 Dec 182273.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 182273.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
21 Feb 183081.1DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for Anne-Antoine-Jules de Clermont-Tonnerre:
Cardinal Anne-Antoine-Jules de Clermont-Tonnerre (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a bishop for 47.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1822
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013