Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme Hennequin

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547¹Born
17 Aug 158740.6AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
30 Aug 158740.6Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
10 Mar 161972.1DiedBishop of Soissons, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Hennequin
Bishop Jérôme Hennequin (born 1547, died ) Bishop of Soissons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast