Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Amelot de Gournay

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1624BornParis
5 Jan 167146.3SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
15 Feb 167146.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lavaur, France
22 Jul 167146.9ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
2 Aug 167146.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
16 Jan 167348.4SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
11 Sep 167349.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
17 Feb 168762.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Amelot de Gournay:
Archbishop Michel Amelot de Gournay (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395, and Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015