Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Éric Marie Pierre Henri Aumonier

Bishop of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1946 Born
2 Jul 197125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
12 Jul 199650.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
12 Jul 199650.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Malliana
11 Oct 199650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Malliana
11 Jan 200154.8AppointedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Éric Marie Pierre Henri Aumonier (VIAF: 318979)
Bishop Éric Marie Pierre Henri Aumonier (born ) Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Versailles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,857
  • op: CB, 21 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast