Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-René Asseline

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1742²BornParis
18 Oct 178947.7SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
14 Dec 178947.9ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
3 Jan 179048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
10 Apr 181371.2DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-René Asseline
Bishop Jean-René Asseline (born 1742, died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016