Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard de Daillon du Lude

Deceased

Bishop of Albi


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1631AppointedBishop of Agen, France
24 Aug 1631Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
Oct 1634³SelectedBishop of Albi, France
28 Jan 1636ConfirmedBishop of Albi, France
25 Jul 1676DiedBishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspard de Daillon du Lude:
Bishop Gaspard de Daillon du Lude (died ) Bishop of Albi

  • a bishop for 44.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 72, and Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013