Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Guillaume Le Jay

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹Born
1672¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 168034.6SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
28 Apr 168135.3ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
1 Jun 168135.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
22 Apr 169347.3DiedBishop of Cahors, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Guillaume Le Jay
Bishop Henri-Guillaume Le Jay (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 21.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast