Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Cardinal de La Rochefoucauld

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senlis, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1558Born
29 Jul 158526.6AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
27 Sep 158526.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Sep 158526.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 158526.8Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
10 Dec 160749.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 161051.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
15 Feb 161051.1AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
19 Sep 162263.7ResignedBishop of Senlis, France
14 Feb 164586.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Senlis, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for François de La Rochefoucauld (VIAF: 54213028)
François Cardinal de La Rochefoucauld (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senlis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSainte-Catherine, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceSte. Geneviève, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original) Saint Jean-Baptiste chapel, Ste. Geneviève, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 59.3 years
  • a cardinal for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1607
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018