Birthdate | Age | Name | Current Title |
14 May 1984 |
| Mister Gleison De Paula Souza | Secretary of the Dicastery for the Laity, the Family and Life |
28 Dec 1982 |
| Bishop Isaac Jules Peter Georges Boutros | Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon |
10 Sep 1982 |
| Archbishop Younan (Benedict Qusay Mubarak Abdullah) Hano | Archbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq |
29 May 1982 |
| Bishop Mykola Semenyshyn | Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
11 Oct 1981 |
| Bishop Cristian Dumitru Crişan | Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania |
7 Oct 1981 |
| Bishop Stepan Sus | Curial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
13 Apr 1981 |
| Bishop Andriy Khimyak | Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
4 Aug 1980 |
| Bishop Bernardo Andrés Álvarez Tapia | Auxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile |
18 May 1980 |
| Bishop Maksym Ryabukha, S.D.B. | Auxiliary Bishop of Donets’k (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
2 May 1980 |
| Bishop Yaacoub Camil Afram Antoine Semaan | Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Palestine and Jordan) (Syrian), Palestine |
13 Feb 1980 |
| Bishop Mykola Bychok, C.SS.R. | Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia |
17 Jul 1979 |
| Bishop Rami Flaviano Al-Kabalan | Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) |
3 Jun 1979 |
| Bishop Petro Loza, C.SS.R. | Auxiliary Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
11 May 1979 |
| Bishop Maciej Małyga | Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland |
16 Mar 1979 |
| Bishop Ivan Kulyk | Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
2 Mar 1979 |
| Bishop Oleksandr Yazlovetskiy | Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine |
28 Dec 1978 |
| Bishop Milan Stipić | Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia |
4 Nov 1978 |
| Bishop Adrian Put | Auxiliary Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland |
2 Jul 1978 |
| Bishop Roko Glasnović | Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia |
17 Apr 1978 |
| Bishop Eduard Kava, O.F.M. Conv. | Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine |
4 Apr 1978 |
| Archbishop Imad Khoshaba Gargees | Archbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran |
16 Jan 1978 |
| Bishop Pavlo Honcharuk | Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine |
17 Dec 1977 |
| Bishop Benedek Szabolcs Fekete | Auxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary |
1 Oct 1977 |
| Bishop Christian Carlassare, M.C.C.I. | Bishop of Rumbek, South Sudan |
28 Sep 1977 |
| Bishop Ephrem Elie Joseph Warde | Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt |
14 Sep 1977 |
| Bishop Tulio Omar Pérez Rivera | Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala |
1 Jun 1977 |
| Bishop Vito Piccinonna | Bishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy |
21 Jan 1977 |
| Archbishop Arjan Dodaj, F.D.C. | Archbishop of Tiranë-Durrës, Albania |
4 Jan 1977 |
| Bishop Eloy Ricardo Domínguez Martínez | Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba |
27 Dec 1976 |
| Bishop Joseph Armando Espaillat | Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA |
10 Dec 1976 |
| Bishop Henry Juma Odonya | Bishop of Kitale, Kenya |
10 Nov 1976 |
| Bishop Waldemar Musioł | Auxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland |
2 Oct 1976 |
| Bishop Carlos Alberto Santos García | Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México |
16 Sep 1976 |
| Bishop Yosafat Moschych, C.M.S.A.A. | Bishop of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
19 Aug 1976 |
| Bishop Volodymyr Hrutsa, C.SS.R. | Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
28 Jun 1976 |
| Bishop Piotr Przyborek | Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland |
20 Jun 1976 |
| Bishop Yohane Suzgo Nyirenda | Auxiliary Bishop of Mzuzu, Malawi |
19 Jun 1976 |
| Bishop Hryhoriy Komar | Auxiliary Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
13 May 1976 |
| Bishop Antony Prince Panengaden | Bishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India |
8 May 1976 |
| Bishop Volodymyr Firman | Auxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
30 Apr 1976 |
| Bishop Gjergj Meta | Bishop of Rrëshen, Albania |
14 Feb 1976 |
| Bishop Paul Thabet Habib Yousif Al Mekko | Bishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq |
2 Jan 1976 |
| Bishop Léonard Ndjadi Ndjate, M.C.C.I. | Auxiliary Bishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
1 Nov 1975 |
| Bishop Toussaint Ngoma Foumanet, C.S.Sp. | Bishop of Dolisie, Congo |
1 Oct 1975 |
| Bishop Andriy Rabiy | Auxiliary Bishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada |
27 Jul 1975 |
| Bishop Yevgeniy Zinkovskiy | Auxiliary Bishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan |
17 Jul 1975 |
| Bishop Federico Guillermo Wechsung | Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina |
26 Jun 1975 |
| Bishop Francisco Agamenilton Damascena | Bishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil |
1 Jun 1975 |
| Bishop Juan Fernando Franco Sánchez | Bishop of Caldas, Colombia |
22 Apr 1975 |
| Bishop Steven Joseph Lopes | Ordinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA |
16 Apr 1975 |
| Bishop Antônio Ederaldo de Santana | Bishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil |
11 Apr 1975 |
| Bishop Francisco Figueroa Cervantes | Auxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México |
23 Mar 1975 |
| Bishop Nicolas Pierre Jean Lhernould | Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria |
15 Mar 1975 |
| Bishop John Bogna Bakeni | Auxiliary Bishop of Maiduguri, Nigeria |
14 Mar 1975 |
| Bishop Basilio Mamani Quispe | Auxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia |
13 Mar 1975 |
| Bishop Cicero Alves de França | Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil |
19 Jan 1975 |
| Bishop Felix (Saeed) Dawood Al Shabi | Bishop of Zākhō (Zaku) (Chaldean), Iraq |
16 Jan 1975 |
| Bishop Stephen Xu Hongwei | Coadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China |
7 Jan 1975 |
| Bishop Reginei José Modolo | Auxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil |
3 Jan 1975 |
| Archbishop Atanasius Firas Mundher Dardar | Patriarchal Exarch of Bassorah e Golfo (Syrian), Iraq |
30 Dec 1974 |
| Bishop Adam Piotr Bab | Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland |
28 Dec 1974 |
| Bishop George Muthaka, O.F.M. Cap. | Bishop of Garissa, Kenya |
16 Dec 1974 |
| Bishop Ramón Darío Valdivia Jiménez | Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain |
14 Nov 1974 |
| Sister Alessandra Smerilli, F.M.A. | Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development |
12 Nov 1974 |
| Bishop Aurélio Pinto de Sousa | Bishop of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil |
22 Sep 1974 |
| Bishop Benoni Ambăruş | Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy |
21 Sep 1974 |
| Bishop Edinson Edgardo Farfán Córdova, O.S.A. | Prelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru |
12 Aug 1974 |
| Bishop Loïc Philippe Lagadec | Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France |
6 Aug 1974 |
| Bishop Aliaksandr Yasheuski, S.D.B. | Auxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus |
2 Aug 1974 |
| Bishop Eusebius Jelous Nyathi | Bishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe |
29 Jun 1974 |
| Bishop Farly Yovany Gil Betancur | Bishop of Montelibano, Colombia |
10 Jun 1974 |
| Bishop Massimiliano Palinuro | Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey |
7 Jun 1974 |
| Giorgio Cardinal Marengo, I.M.C. | Prefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia |
23 May 1974 |
| Bishop Giovani Edgar Arana | Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia |
14 May 1974 |
| Archbishop Visvaldas Kulbokas | Apostolic Nuncio to Ukraine |
13 May 1974 |
| Bishop Erik Varden, O.C.S.O. | Prelate of Trondheim, Norway |
12 May 1974 |
| Bishop Sławomir Szkredka | Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA |
10 May 1974 |
| Bishop Leandro Maria Alves | Bishop of Baucau, Timor-Leste |
6 May 1974 |
| Bishop Jesús Vidal Chamorro | Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain |
4 May 1974 |
| Bishop Hani Nassif Wasef Bakhoum Kiroulos | Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt |
2 May 1974 |
| Bishop Joseph Andrew Williams | Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA |
30 Mar 1974 |
| Bishop Raphael Mweempwa | Bishop of Monze, Zambia |
26 Mar 1974 |
| Bishop Mykola Petro Luchok, O.P. | Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács), Ukraine |
2 Mar 1974 |
| Bishop Marcos José dos Santos | Bishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil |
9 Feb 1974 |
| Bishop François Abeli Muhoya Mutchapa | Bishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
1 Feb 1974 |
| Bishop Teodor (Taras) Martynyuk, M.S.U. | Auxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
29 Jan 1974 |
| Bishop Dariusz Zalewski | Auxiliary Bishop of Ełk, Poland |
21 Jan 1974 |
| Bishop Marek Forgáč | Auxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia |
13 Jan 1974 |
| Bishop Antonio Prieto Lucena | Bishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain |
13 Jan 1974 |
| Bishop Roberto Rosmaninho Mariz | Auxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal |
10 Jan 1974 |
| Bishop Juan Rafael Esposito-Garcia | Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA |
19 Dec 1973 |
| Bishop Emmanuel Bernardino Lowi Napeta | Bishop of Torit, South Sudan |
19 Dec 1973 |
| Bishop Milad Jawish, B.S. | Bishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada |
13 Dec 1973 |
| Bishop Héctor López Alvarado | Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México |
12 Dec 1973 |
| Bishop António Lungieki Pedro Bengui | Auxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola |
12 Dec 1973 |
| Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves Aguiar | Bishop of Setúbal, Portugal |
29 Nov 1973 |
| Bishop Francisco Javier Acero Pérez, O.A.R. | Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District |
25 Nov 1973 |
| Bishop Moises Magpantay Cuevas | Vicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines |
24 Nov 1973 |
| Bishop Paul Daisuke Narui, S.V.D. | Bishop of Niigata, Japan |
18 Nov 1973 |
| Bishop Levente Balázs Martos | Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary |