Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Le Cordier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1904Born
17 Dec 192723.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 192824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
15 May 195652.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
15 May 195652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
23 Jun 195652.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
9 Oct 196662.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis, France
1 Apr 197874.0RetiredBishop of Saint-Denis, France
17 Feb 200398.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Le Cordier (VIAF: 12453297)
Bishop Jacques Le Cordier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis
Death PlaceSaint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis

  • a priest for 74.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 54
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast