Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Le Comte

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1629BornParis
31 Mar 166838.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 168151.5SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
13 Jul 168252.5ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
16 Aug 168252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
6 Sep 168353.6DiedBishop of Grasse, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Le Comte:
Bishop Antoine Le Comte (born , died ) Bishop of Grasse

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015