Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Henriau

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661BornParis
6 May 172463.3SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
11 Sep 172463.7ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
28 Oct 172463.8Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
25 Jan 173877.1DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Henriau:
Bishop Jean-Marie Henriau (died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013