Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-François-Paul Cardinal de Gondi de Retz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1613BornMontmirail-en-Brie
12 Jun 164329.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
5 Oct 164330.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
5 Oct 164330.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
Nov 1643³30.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 164430.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
19 Feb 165238.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Mar 165440.5SucceededArchbishop of Paris, France
14 May 165541.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
15 Feb 166248.4ResignedArchbishop of Paris, France
24 Aug 167965.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Paul de Gondi de Retz:
Jean-François-Paul Cardinal de Gondi de Retz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
  • a cardinal for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015