Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Louis Coloni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1927Born
29 Jun 195325.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
17 Apr 195426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
11 May 198254.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
11 May 198254.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
8 Oct 198255.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
30 Jan 198961.4AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
8 Dec 200275.2AppointedArchbishop of Dijon, France
13 Feb 200476.4RetiredArchbishop of Dijon, France
6 Jul 201688.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Louis Coloni (VIAF: 71402456)
Archbishop Michel Louis Coloni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceTivernon, Diocese of Orléans
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Bénigne, Cathedral, Dijon, Archdiocese of Dijon

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 6 Jul 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast