Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aaron Jean-Marie Cardinal Lustiger

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1926Born
21 Aug 194013.9Converted
29 Jun 195326.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
17 Apr 195427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
10 Nov 197953.1AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
8 Dec 197953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
31 Jan 198154.3AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
12 Mar 198154.4AppointedOrdinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
2 Feb 198356.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198356.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
26 Nov 199468.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi dei Francesi
11 Feb 200578.4RetiredArchbishop of Paris, France
14 Mar 200578.4RetiredOrdinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
5 Aug 200780.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Aaron Jean-Marie Lustiger (VIAF: 39380557)
Aaron Jean-Marie Cardinal Lustiger (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
  • a cardinal for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast