Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de La Rochetaillée (de Font)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Administrator of Besançon


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1412AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
13 Jul 1412AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Papoul, France
23 Sep 1418AppointedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
12 Jun 1422AppointedAdministrator of Paris, France
26 Jun 1423AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
24 May 1426AppointedAdministrator of Rouen, France
24 May 1426Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 1426AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
14 Oct 1429AppointedAdministrator of Besançon, France
1431²ResignedAdministrator of Rouen, France
24 Mar 1437DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de La Rochetaillée (de Font):
Cardinal Jean de La Rochetaillée (de Font) (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013