Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Jean Louis Breton

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1936Born
28 Mar 196629.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nanterre, France
22 Dec 196630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nanterre, France
3 Nov 197538.9IncardinatedPriest of Paris, France
18 Jun 200265.6AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
29 Sep 200265.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aire et Dax, France
24 Jan 201275.2RetiredBishop of Aire et Dax, France
29 Apr 202083.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Jean Louis Breton
Bishop Philippe Jean Louis Breton (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Ordained PriestChapel, Carms, Seminary, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopArènes municipales, Arenas, Diocese of Aire et Dax
Death PlaceMaison Marie-Thérèse, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,256
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • od/c01/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: AJ, 29 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Apr 2020

Quantcast