Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Guénolé Louis Marie Cardinal Daniélou, S.J. †

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Saba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1905Born
20 Aug 193833.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Apr 196963.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
11 Apr 196963.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
19 Apr 196963.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
28 Apr 196963.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Saba
28 Apr 196963.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 197469.0DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Jean Guénolé Louis Marie Daniélou (VIAF: 4928609)
Jean Guénolé Louis Marie Cardinal Daniélou S.J. (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018