Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles-Martial-Allemand Cardinal Lavigerie

Deceased

Archbishop of Alger

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

Archbishop of Carthage


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1825BornSaint-Esprit, Huire
Dec 1848³23.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
2 Jun 184923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
11 Mar 186337.3SelectedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
16 Mar 186337.3ConfirmedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
22 Mar 186337.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
19 Jan 186741.2SelectedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
27 Mar 186741.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
27 Mar 188256.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 188256.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
10 Nov 188459.0AppointedArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia
26 Nov 189267.0DiedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Martial-Allemand Lavigerie
Charles-Martial-Allemand Cardinal Lavigerie (born , died ) Archbishop of Alger

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 89, and Page 185
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 401, and Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Mar 1882
  • od: CB, 22 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016