Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosme Roger, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornParis
23 Feb 164126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
5 Jan 167156.0SelectedBishop of Lombez, France
14 Dec 167156.9ConfirmedBishop of Lombez, France
31 Jan 167257.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
20 Dec 171095.9DiedBishop of Lombez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosme Roger:
Bishop Cosme Roger O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Lombez

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015