Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Lebret

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1645AppointedBishop of Toul, France
7 May 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
15 Jun 1645DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Lebret
Bishop Jacques Lebret (died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1645, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018