Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Fieux

Deceased

Bishop of Toul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornParis
21 Jun 167554.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Toul, France
9 Sep 167554.6SucceededBishop of Toul, France
2 Dec 167655.9ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
17 Jan 167756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
18 Aug 167756.6InstalledBishop of Toul, France
15 Mar 168766.2DiedBishop of Toul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Fieux:
Bishop Jacques de Fieux (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Toul

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015