Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Louis-Camille Debray

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1892Born
3 Jun 192027.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 192027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
15 Jan 194148.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meaux, France
15 Jan 194148.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
25 Mar 194148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
25 Jul 194249.8SucceededBishop of Meaux, France
29 Apr 196168.5DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Louis-Camille Debray (VIAF: 14853623)
Bishop Georges-Louis-Camille Debray (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Étienne, Cathedral, Meaux, Diocese of Meaux

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 17
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast