Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anne Cardinal d’Escars de Givry (de Pérusse), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1546Born
1 Oct 158438.5SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
28 Jan 158538.8ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
1 May 158539.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
5 Jun 159650.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159952.9ResignedBishop of Lisieux, France
3 Mar 160356.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Langres, France
14 Jun 160458.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
23 May 160862.1SelectedBishop of Metz, France
10 Sep 160862.4ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
19 Apr 161266.0DiedBishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Anne d’Escars de Givry (de Pérusse) (VIAF: 208278297)
Anne Cardinal d’Escars de Givry (de Pérusse) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopLisieux, Diocese of Lisieux
Death PlaceCastle, Vic-sur-Seille, Moselle, Diocese of Metz
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Metz, Diocese of Metz

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 15.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast