Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Pierre Deniau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1936Born
17 Dec 196024.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 196124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
9 Oct 196630.0IncardinatedPriest of Nanterre, France
26 Jun 199861.7AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
4 Oct 199862.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
27 Aug 201174.8RetiredBishop of Nevers, France
12 Jan 201477.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Pierre Deniau (VIAF: 44297794)
Bishop Francis Joseph Pierre Deniau (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Cyr and Sainte-Julitte, Cathedral, Nevers, Diocese of Nevers
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Cyr and Sainte-Julitte, Cathedral, Nevers, Diocese of Nevers

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,441
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast