Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1683Born
27 Mar 172844.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
14 Jun 172844.6ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
22 Aug 172844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
30 Jun 173450.6DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville
Bishop Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast