Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Marie Delarue

Deceased

Bishop of Nanterre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1914Born
22 Oct 193925.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 196652.1AppointedBishop of Nanterre, France
20 Nov 196652.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nanterre, France
23 Aug 198267.9DiedBishop of Nanterre, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Marie Delarue
Bishop Jacques Marie Delarue (born , died ) Bishop of Nanterre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast