Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Joseph Jean Cardinal Poupard

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1930 BornBouzillé, France
18 Dec 195424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
2 Feb 197948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
2 Feb 197948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
6 Apr 197948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
27 Jun 198049.8AppointedPro-President of the Secretariat of Non-Believers
25 May 198554.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198554.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio
27 May 198554.7AppointedPresident of the Secretariat of Non-Believers
19 Apr 198857.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
4 May 199362.7ResignedPresident of the Secretariat of Non-Believers
29 Jan 199665.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
2 Apr 200574.6CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
21 Apr 200574.6ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
11 Mar 200675.5AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
25 Jun 200776.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
3 Sep 200777.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Jean Poupard:
Cardinal Paul Joseph Jean Poupard (born ) President Emeritus of Culture

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Culture.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013