Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Raymond-Marie-Marcel Piquet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nha Trang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1888BornParis, France
29 Sep 191224.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Nov 194355.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quinhon, Viet Nam
11 Nov 194355.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Eriza
18 Jan 194455.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eriza
5 Jul 195768.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
24 Nov 196072.2AppointedBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
3 Jul 196677.9DiedBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Raymond-Marie-Marcel Piquet:
Bishop Paul Raymond-Marie-Marcel Piquet M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nha Trang

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013