Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Jean Guyard

Bishop Emeritus of Le Havre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1936 Born
31 Oct 196428.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
25 Jun 196529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
9 Jul 200367.0AppointedBishop of Le Havre, France
12 Oct 200367.3Ordained BishopBishop of Le Havre, France
17 Oct 200367.3InstalledBishop of Le Havre, France
24 Jun 201175.0RetiredBishop of Le Havre, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Jean Guyard
Bishop Michel Jean Guyard (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Havre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Justin, Church, Levallois-Perret, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSalle municipale "Dock Océane", Le Havre, Diocese of Le Havre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Le Havre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,473
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast