Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolas-Charles Cardinal de Saulx-Tavannes

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1690BornParis
11 Jan 172130.3SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
24 Sep 172131.0ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
9 Nov 172131.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
28 Aug 173342.9SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Dec 173343.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
5 Apr 175665.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 175968.5DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Charles de Saulx-Tavannes:
Nicolas-Charles Cardinal de Saulx-Tavannes (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015