Birthdate | Age | Name | Current Title |
1924 |
| Bishop Thomas Zhao Duomo (Zhao Kexun) | Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China |
17 Apr 1927 |
| Luis Pascual Cardinal Dri, O.F.M. Cap. | Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin |
18 Oct 1928 |
| Ernest Cardinal Simoni | Priest of Shkodrë-Pult, Albania |
7 Jan 1929 |
| Bishop Melchior Shi Hongzhen | Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China |
23 May 1931 |
| Lucian Cardinal Mureşan | Major Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania |
1 Dec 1931 |
| Bishop Louis Yu Ren Shen (Yu Runchen) | Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China |
30 Jan 1934 |
| Giovanni Battista Cardinal Re | Dean of the College of Cardinals |
8 Feb 1934 |
| Bishop Joseph Zhao Fengchang | Bishop of Yanggu [Yangku], China |
5 Jun 1934 |
| Bishop Julius Jia Zhiguo (Kia Zhi Cuo, Jia Shoushen) | Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China |
2 May 1936 |
| Bishop Joseph Arnaouti, I.C.P.B. | Patriarchal Exarch of Damas (Armenian), Syria |
17 Dec 1936 |
| Pope Jorge Mario Bergoglio, S.J. | Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy) |
17 Feb 1937 |
| Bishop Mathias Gu Zheng, S.J. | Bishop of Xining [Sining], China |
25 Oct 1938 |
| Archbishop Basile Georges Casmoussa | Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) |
25 Feb 1940 |
| Béchara Boutros Cardinal Raï, O.M.M. | Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon |
8 Mar 1940 |
| [Bishop Richard Nelson Williamson], S.S.P.X. | Bishop |
4 Jun 1940 |
| Bishop Nicholas Han Jide, O.F.M. Cap. | Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China |
1941 |
| Father Thomas Oliha Attiyah, A.J. | Priest of Apostles of Jesus Missionaries |
14 Apr 1942 |
| Archbishop Elias Youssef Rahal, S.M.S.P. | Archbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon |
6 Aug 1943 |
| Archbishop Thomas Meram | Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran |
21 Oct 1943 |
| Archbishop Boghos Lévon Zékiyan | Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey |
9 Nov 1943 |
| Bishop Sarkis Davidian, I.C.P.B. | Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan} (Armenian), Iran |
27 Dec 1943 |
| Jean Cardinal Zerbo | Archbishop of Bamako, Mali |
8 Feb 1944 |
| Bishop Brian Farrell, L.C. | Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity |
12 Feb 1944 |
| Pedro Ricardo Cardinal Barreto Jimeno, S.J. | Archbishop of Huancayo, Peru |
24 Feb 1944 |
| José Luis Cardinal Lacunza Maestrojuán, O.A.R. | Bishop of David, Panama |
3 Apr 1944 |
| Archbishop Michel-Marie-Bernard Calvet, S.M. | Archbishop of Nouméa, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania) |
8 Apr 1944 |
| Louis-Marie Ling Cardinal Mangkhanekhoun, I.V.D. | Vicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos |
29 Jun 1944 |
| Seán Patrick Cardinal O’Malley, O.F.M. Cap. | Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA |
15 Sep 1944 |
| Mauro Cardinal Piacenza | Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary |
10 Oct 1944 |
| Baltazar Enrique Cardinal Porras Cardozo | Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela |
13 Oct 1944 |
| Father Juan González Núñez, M.C.C.I. | Apostolic Administrator of Awasa, Ethiopia |
27 Oct 1944 |
| Father Fernando Ocáriz Braña | Prelate of Opus Dei |
15 Nov 1944 |
| Patriarch Ignace Joseph III (Ephrem) Younan | Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon |
24 Dec 1944 |
| Oswald Cardinal Gracias | Archbishop of Bombay, India |
22 Jan 1945 |
| Christoph Cardinal Schönborn, O.P. | Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria |
31 Jan 1945 |
| Archbishop Dionisio Guillermo García Ibáñez | Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba |
1 Mar 1945 |
| Fernando Cardinal Vérgez Alzaga, L.C. | President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State |
17 Mar 1945 |
| Bishop Dennis Joseph Sullivan | Bishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA |
20 Apr 1945 |
| Archbishop Vincenzo Paglia | President of the Pontifical Academy for Life |
5 May 1945 |
| Bishop Kazimierz Wielikosielec, O.P. | Auxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus |
27 May 1945 |
| Bishop Álvaro Julio Beyra Luarca | Bishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba |
4 Jul 1945 |
| Stanisław Cardinal Ryłko | Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica} |
20 Jul 1945 |
| Bishop Terence Robert Curtin | Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia |
14 Sep 1945 |
| [Bishop Bernard Tissier de Mallerais], S.S.P.X. | Bishop |
8 Nov 1945 |
| Vincent Gerard Cardinal Nichols | Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain |
15 Nov 1945 |
| Bishop Martin Albert Happe, M. Afr. | Bishop of Nouakchott, Mauritania |
18 Nov 1945 |
| Bishop Timoteo Hikmat Beylouni | Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Syrian) |
22 Dec 1945 |
| Jean-Pierre Cardinal Kutwa | Archbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire |
25 Dec 1945 |
| Archbishop Nicolas Antiba, B.A. | Patriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria |
3 Jan 1946 |
| Bishop Antoine Audo, S.J. | Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria |
5 Jan 1946 |
| Mario Cardinal Zenari | Apostolic Nuncio to Syria |
30 Jan 1946 |
| Christophe Louis Yves Georges Cardinal Pierre | Apostolic Nuncio to United States of America |
9 Feb 1946 |
| Bishop Joseph Prathan Sridarunsil, S.D.B. | Bishop of Surat Thani, Thailand |
15 Feb 1946 |
| Bishop Joaquín Mariano Sucunza | Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina |
7 Mar 1946 |
| Bishop Gerald Almeida | Bishop of Jabalpur, India |
11 Mar 1946 |
| Bishop Christo Proykov | Bishop of Saint John XXIII of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria |
13 Apr 1946 |
| Archbishop Orlando Brandes | Archbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil |
15 Apr 1946 |
| Bishop Antonysamy Francis | Bishop of Kumbakonam, India |
15 Apr 1946 |
| Fernando Cardinal Filoni | Grand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem |
21 Apr 1946 |
| Juan José Cardinal Omella Omella | Archbishop of Barcelona, Spain |
22 Apr 1946 |
| Bishop José Figueroa Gómez | Bishop of Granada en Colombia |
27 Apr 1946 |
| Father Pablo Hernando Moreno, O.S.A. | Priest of Order of St. Augustine |
1 Jun 1946 |
| Bishop Joseph Pibul Visitnondachai | Bishop of Nakhon Sawan, Thailand |
18 Jun 1946 |
| Bishop Robert Peter Deeley | Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA |
20 Jun 1946 |
| Patriarch Youssef (Joseph) Absi, S.M.S.P. | Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria |
30 Jun 1946 |
| Archbishop Jean Benjamin Sleiman, O.C.D. | Archbishop of Baghdad, Iraq |
2 Jul 1946 |
| Bishop Paulo Dionisio Lachovicz (Liakhovych), O.S.B.M. | Apostolic Exarch of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian) |
9 Jul 1946 |
| Archbishop John Michael Miller, C.S.B. | Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada |
16 Jul 1946 |
| Bishop Francis An Shuxin | Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-Yüan], China |
18 Jul 1946 |
| Michael F. Cardinal Czerny, S.J. | Prefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development |
22 Jul 1946 |
| Archbishop Rolando Octavus Joven Tria Tirona, O.C.D. | Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines |
14 Aug 1946 |
| Bishop Norbert Klemens Strotmann Hoppe, M.S.C. | Bishop of Chosica, Peru |
16 Aug 1946 |
| Bishop Guillermo Orozco Montoya | Bishop of Girardota, Colombia |
19 Aug 1946 |
| Archbishop Denys Antoine Chahda | Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria |
15 Sep 1946 |
| Bishop Salvatore Ronald Matano | Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA |
13 Oct 1946 |
| Bishop Edgar de Jesús Garcia Gil | Bishop of Palmira, Colombia |
15 Oct 1946 |
| Bishop Óscar Vicente Ojea Quintana | Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina |
18 Oct 1946 |
| Archbishop Aldo Cavalli | Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) |
8 Nov 1946 |
| Bishop Arthur Joseph Colgan, C.S.C. | Auxiliary Bishop of Chosica, Peru |
24 Nov 1946 |
| Patriarch Raphaël Bedros XXI Minassian, I.C.P.B. | Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon |
6 Dec 1946 |
| Bishop Andrés Vargas Peña | Bishop of Xochimilco, México, México |
28 Dec 1946 |
| Bishop Giorgio Bertin, O.F.M. | Bishop of Djibouti |
3 Feb 1947 |
| Emil Paul Cardinal Tscherrig | Apostolic Nuncio to Italy |
6 Feb 1947 |
| Bishop Mark Edward Brennan | Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA |
19 Feb 1947 |
| Bishop Lourdunada Daniel | Bishop of Nashik, India |
22 Feb 1947 |
| Bishop Jurij Bizjak | Bishop of Koper, Slovenia |
23 Feb 1947 |
| Archbishop Peter Turang | Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia |
25 Feb 1947 |
| Giuseppe Cardinal Betori | Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy |
20 Mar 1947 |
| Bishop José Roberto Ospina Leongómez | Bishop of Buga, Colombia |
4 Apr 1947 |
| Bishop Janvier Kataka Luvete | Bishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
10 Apr 1947 |
| Bishop Rafael Sandoval Sandoval, M.N.M. | Bishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México |
23 Apr 1947 |
| Bishop Heinz Wilhelm Steckling, O.M.I. | Bishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay |
24 Apr 1947 |
| João Cardinal Bráz de Aviz | Prefect of the Dicastery for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life |
8 May 1947 |
| Bishop Antun Škvorčević | Bishop of Požega, Croatia |
11 May 1947 |
| Bishop Luis Felipe Sánchez Aponte | Bishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia |
28 May 1947 |
| Bishop Ralph Walker Nickless | Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA |
8 Jun 1947 |
| Bishop Luigi Antonio Secco, S.D.B. | Bishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles |
26 Jun 1947 |
| Bishop Luis Quinteiro Fiuza | Bishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain |
29 Jun 1947 |
| Archbishop John Baptist Odama | Archbishop of Gulu, Uganda |
16 Jul 1947 |
| Archbishop Alfonso Cortés Contreras | Archbishop of León, Guanajuato, México |
16 Jul 1947 |
| Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini Imeri | Bishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala |
22 Jul 1947 |
| Bishop Claude Champagne, O.M.I. | Bishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada |
27 Jul 1947 |
| Bishop Gabriel Akwasi Ababio Mante | Bishop of Jasikan, Ghana |
27 Jul 1947 |
| Father Giovanni Salonia, O.F.M. Cap. | Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin |
5 Aug 1947 |
| Bishop Manolo Alarcon de los Santos | Bishop of Virac, Philippines |
14 Aug 1947 |
| Bishop Augustinus Tumaole Bane, O.M.I. | Bishop of Leribe, Lesotho |
21 Aug 1947 |
| Bishop Liam Stephen Cary | Bishop of Baker, Oregon, USA |
29 Aug 1947 |
| Bishop Antranig Ayvazian | Bishop of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria |
2 Sep 1947 |
| Kevin Joseph Cardinal Farrell | Prefect of the Dicastery for the Laity, the Family and Life |
2 Sep 1947 |
| Archbishop Antonio Mennini | Official of the Secretariat of State |
2 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop José Eduardo Velásquez Tarazona | Bishop of Huaraz, Peru |
6 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop Cletus Chandrasiri Perera, O.S.B. | Bishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka |
12 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop Clement Tirkey | Bishop of Jalpaiguri, India |
18 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop Óscar Armando Campos Contreras | Bishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México |
22 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop Paolo Bizzeti, S.J. | Vicar Apostolic of Anatolia, Turkey |
25 Sep 1947 |
| Bishop Ulrich Boom | Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany |
12 Oct 1947 |
| Bishop Joseph Sama | Bishop of Nouna, Burkina Faso |
23 Oct 1947 |
| Bishop Agustín Cortés Soriano | Bishop of Sant Feliu de Llobregat, Spain |
23 Oct 1947 |
| Bishop Saúl Figueroa Albornoz | Bishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela |
26 Oct 1947 |
| Bishop José María Yanguas Sanz | Bishop of Cuenca, Spain |
6 Nov 1947 |
| Bishop Manuel da Rocha Felício | Bishop of Guarda, Portugal |
15 Nov 1947 |
| Albert Malcolm Ranjith Cardinal Patabendige Don | Archbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka |
19 Nov 1947 |
| Bishop Roy Edward Campbell, Jr. | Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA |
21 Nov 1947 |
| Archbishop Felix Toppo, S.J. | Archbishop of Ranchi, India |
25 Nov 1947 |
| Bishop Noël Simard | Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada |
7 Dec 1947 |
| Wilton Daniel Cardinal Gregory | Archbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA |
8 Dec 1947 |
| Bishop Mario Fiandri, S.D.B. | Vicar Apostolic of El Petén, Guatemala |
20 Dec 1947 |
| Bishop Alonso Gerardo Garza Treviño | Bishop of Piedras Negras, Coahuila, México |
22 Dec 1947 |
| Marcello Cardinal Semeraro | Prefect of the Dicastery for the Causes of Saints |
26 Dec 1947 |
| Archbishop Buti Joseph Tlhagale, O.M.I. | Archbishop of Johannesburg, South Africa |
31 Dec 1947 |
| Bishop Peter Lee Ki-heon | Bishop of Uijeongbu, Korea (South) |
1948 |
| Abbot Jean-Michel Girard, C.R.B. | Apostolic Administrator of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland |
7 Jan 1948 |
| Bishop Jan de Groef, M. Afr. | Bishop of Bethlehem, South Africa |
28 Jan 1948 |
| Archbishop Celso Morga Iruzubieta | Archbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain |
28 Jan 1948 |
| Bishop Sebastián Taltavull Anglada | Bishop of Mallorca, Spain |
6 Feb 1948 |
| Bishop Ladislav Hučko | Apostolic Exarch of Czech Republic (Ruthenian) |
6 Feb 1948 |
| Archbishop Adolfo Tito Camacho Yllana | Apostolic Nuncio to Israel |
8 Feb 1948 |
| Bishop Joseph Osei-Bonsu | Bishop of Konongo-Mampong, Ghana |
16 Feb 1948 |
| Bishop John Fleming | Bishop of Killala, Ireland |
26 Feb 1948 |
| Archbishop Boutros Marayati | Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria |
14 Mar 1948 |
| Bishop Joaquim Augusto da Silva Mendes, S.D.B. | Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal |
30 Mar 1948 |
| Bishop Method Kilaini | Auxiliary Bishop of Bukoba, Tanzania |
31 Mar 1948 |
| Bishop Gregory James Studerus | Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA |
13 Apr 1948 |
| Bishop Guy Harpigny | Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium |
18 Apr 1948 |
| Bishop Georges Miled Saad Abi Younes, O.L.M. | Bishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite) |
22 Apr 1948 |
| Bishop Emanuel Messias de Oliveira | Bishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil |
23 Apr 1948 |
| Archbishop Ilario Antoniazzi | Archbishop of Tunis, Tunisia |
27 Apr 1948 |
| Bishop Dèr Raphaël Kusiélé Dabiré | Bishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso |
3 May 1948 |
| Archbishop Paul Yemboaro Ouédraogo | Archbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso |
9 May 1948 |
| Archbishop Miguel Ángel Olaverri Arroniz, S.D.B. | Archbishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo |
13 May 1948 |
| Bishop Justin Bernard Gnanapragasam | Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka |
16 May 1948 |
| Archbishop Domenico Sorrentino | Bishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy |
20 May 1948 |
| Bishop Fidelis Lionel Emmanuel Fernando | Bishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka |
26 May 1948 |
| Bishop Philippe Rukamba | Bishop of Butare, Rwanda |
29 May 1948 |
| Bishop Edward Bernard Scharfenberger | Bishop of Albany, New York, USA |
31 May 1948 |
| Bishop Salvador Giménez Valls | Bishop of Lleida, Spain |
6 Jun 1948 |
| Archbishop Felix Anthony Machado | Bishop of Vasai, India |
9 Jun 1948 |
| Archbishop Dario Campos, O.F.M. | Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil |
10 Jun 1948 |
| Bishop Pedro Felipe Bacarreza Rodríguez | Bishop of Santa Maria de Los Ángeles, Chile |
15 Jun 1948 |
| Bishop Pierre Warin | Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium |
16 Jun 1948 |
| Bishop Wilhelm Zimmermann | Auxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany |
17 Jun 1948 |
| Archbishop Richard Joseph Gagnon | Archbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada |
19 Jun 1948 |
| Archbishop Luigi Bonazzi | Apostolic Nuncio to Albania |
21 Jun 1948 |
| Bishop Aloísio Alberto Dilli, O.F.M. | Bishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil |
21 Jun 1948 |
| Archbishop Dennis Marion Schnurr | Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA |
5 Jul 1948 |
| Archbishop Héctor Miguel Cabrejos Vidarte, O.F.M. | Archbishop of Trujillo, Peru |
5 Jul 1948 |
| Archbishop Joseph Perumthottam | Archbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India |
11 Jul 1948 |
| Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García Rodríguez | Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba |
14 Jul 1948 |
| Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel, C.M. | Archbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
26 Jul 1948 |
| Bishop Joseph Maria Bonnemain, Opus Dei | Bishop of Chur, Switzerland |
28 Jul 1948 |
| Archbishop Salvatore Visco | Archbishop of Capua, Italy |
31 Jul 1948 |
| Bishop Adelio Dell’Oro | Bishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan |
3 Aug 1948 |
| Bishop Stanislas Marie Georges Jude Lalanne | Bishop of Pontoise, France |
4 Aug 1948 |
| Archbishop Domingo Díaz Martínez | Archbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México |
5 Aug 1948 |
| Bishop Rigoberto Corredor Bermúdez | Bishop of Pereira, Colombia |
17 Aug 1948 |
| Bishop Patrick James Zurek | Bishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA |
19 Aug 1948 |
| Giuseppe Cardinal Petrocchi | Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy |
24 Aug 1948 |
| Bishop Andrea Turazzi | Bishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy |
29 Aug 1948 |
| Archbishop Jan Graubner | Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czechia |
30 Aug 1948 |
| Bishop Martin Dada Abejide Olorunmolu | Bishop of Lokoja, Nigeria |
1 Sep 1948 |
| Archbishop Andrea Bruno Mazzocato | Archbishop of Udine, Italy |
8 Sep 1948 |
| Archbishop Philip Naameh | Archbishop of Tamale, Ghana |
17 Sep 1948 |
| Bishop Francisco Antonio Nieto Súa | Bishop of Engativá, Colombia |
23 Sep 1948 |
| Bishop Ramón José Aponte Fernández | Bishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela |
24 Sep 1948 |
| Bishop Gerardo Melgar Viciosa | Bishop of Ciudad Real, Spain |
25 Sep 1948 |
| Archbishop Mark Benedict Coleridge | Archbishop of Brisbane, Australia |
8 Oct 1948 |
| Bishop Jan Baxant | Bishop of Litoměřice, Czechia |
11 Oct 1948 |
| Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal Turkson | Chancellor of the Roman Curia - Other |
13 Oct 1948 |
| Archbishop Salvatore Ligorio | Archbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy |
13 Oct 1948 |
| Archbishop Mario Alberto Molina Palma, O.A.R. | Archbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala |
17 Oct 1948 |
| Bishop Honesto Flores Ongtioco | Bishop of Cubao, Philippines |
21 Oct 1948 |
| Archbishop Allen Henry Vigneron | Archbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA |
25 Oct 1948 |
| Bishop Tarcisius Ngalalekumtwa | Bishop of Iringa, Tanzania |
28 Oct 1948 |
| Archbishop Benjamin Ndiaye | Archbishop of Dakar, Senegal |
29 Oct 1948 |
| Charles Maung Cardinal Bo, S.D.B. | Archbishop of Yangon, Myanmar |
6 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop Sergio Pagano, B. | Prefect of the Vatican Apostolic Archive |
7 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte | Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil |
9 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop Clyde Martin Harvey | Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Antilles |
13 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop Carlos Humberto Malfa | Bishop of Chascomús, Argentina |
14 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop Juan de Dios Hernández Ruiz, S.J. | Bishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba |
17 Nov 1948 |
| Archbishop Eliseo Antonio Ariotti | Apostolic Nuncio to Paraguay |
20 Nov 1948 |
| Bishop John (Gordon) MacWilliam, M. Afr. | Bishop of Laghouat, Algeria |
1 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Heriberto Cavazos Pérez | Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México |
1 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Gaetano Di Pierro, S.C.I. | Bishop of Farafangana, Madagascar |
3 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Sérgio Arthur Braschi | Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil |
8 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Sofronio Aguirre Bancud, S.S.S. | Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines |
15 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Antonino Eugénio Fernandes Dias | Bishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal |
15 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Ambroise Ouédraogo | Bishop of Maradi, Niger |
16 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop César Augusto Franco Martínez | Bishop of Segovia, Spain |
21 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Carlos Enrique Herrera Gutiérrez, O.F.M. | Bishop of Jinotega, Nicaragua |
22 Dec 1948 |
| Archbishop Johannes Liku Ada’ | Archbishop of Makassar, Indonesia |
24 Dec 1948 |
| Archbishop Menghesteab Tesfamariam, M.C.C.I. | Archbishop of Asmara (Eritrean), Eritrea |
1 Jan 1949 |
| Bishop Francisco Canindé Palhano | Bishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil |
6 Jan 1949 |
| Bishop Edward Gabriel Risi, O.M.I. | Bishop of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa |
7 Jan 1949 |
| Bishop Chacko Thottumarickal, S.V.D. | Bishop of Indore, India |
11 Jan 1949 |
| Bishop Joseph Kariyil | Bishop of Cochin, India |
18 Jan 1949 |
| Bishop Paul Patrick Donoghue, S.M. | Bishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania) |
23 Jan 1949 |
| Archbishop Jose Romeo Juanito Orquejo Lazo | Archbishop of Jaro, Philippines |
27 Jan 1949 |
| Archbishop Salvador Piñeiro García-Calderón | Archbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru |
29 Jan 1949 |
| Archbishop Prakash Mallavarapu | Archbishop of Visakhapatnam, India |
8 Feb 1949 |
| Father Jan Sergiusz Gajek, M.I.C. | Apostolic Administrator of Belarus, Faithful of Byzantine Rite (Byzantine) |
9 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Ruben Antonio González Medina, C.M.F. | Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico |
10 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Mario del Valle Moronta Rodríguez | Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela |
17 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop František Rábek | Bishop of Slovakia, Military |
17 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Ambrose Rebello | Bishop of Aurangabad, India |
21 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Franz Josef Gebert | Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany |
23 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Aníbal Nieto Guerra, O.C.D. | Bishop of San Jacinto, Ecuador |
2 Mar 1949 |
| José Francisco Cardinal Robles Ortega | Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México |
3 Mar 1949 |
| Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal Maeda | Archbishop of Osaka-Takamatsu, Japan |
5 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Benoît Comlan Messan Alowonou | Bishop of Kpalimé, Togo |
7 Mar 1949 |
| Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes Solórzano | Archbishop of Managua, Nicaragua |
9 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Mikha Pola Maqdassi | Auxiliary Bishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq |
12 Mar 1949 |
| Archbishop Jerome Edward Listecki | Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA |
17 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Ramón Benito Ángeles Fernández | Auxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic |
19 Mar 1949 |
| Blase Joseph Cardinal Cupich | Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA |
21 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Rolando Crisostomo Santos, C.M. | Bishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea |
23 Mar 1949 |
| Archbishop Angelo Massafra, O.F.M. | Archbishop of Shkodrë-Pult, Albania |
26 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Carlo Bresciani | Bishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy |
27 Mar 1949 |
| Archbishop Thomas John Rodi | Archbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA |
29 Mar 1949 |
| Bishop Mychajlo Koltun, C.SS.R. | Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
12 Apr 1949 |
| Archbishop Leonard Paul Blair | Archbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA |
18 Apr 1949 |
| Bishop Josef Kajnek | Auxiliary Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czechia |
27 Apr 1949 |
| Archbishop Petrus Canisius Mandagi, M.S.C. | Archbishop of Merauke, Indonesia |
28 Apr 1949 |
| Bishop Luis Artemio Flores Calzada | Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México |
29 Apr 1949 |
| Bishop Juan Odilón Martínez García | Bishop of Atlacomulco, México, México |
21 May 1949 |
| Bishop Jean-Pierre Blais | Bishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec, Canada |
23 May 1949 |
| Daniel Nicholas Cardinal DiNardo | Archbishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA |
24 May 1949 |
| Bishop Juan Matogo Oyana, C.M.F. | Bishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea |
27 May 1949 |
| Bishop Serge Patrick Poitras | Bishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada |
3 Jun 1949 |
| Bishop Ignatius Loyola Ivan Mascarenhas | Bishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India |
4 Jun 1949 |
| Archbishop Joseph Fred Naumann | Archbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA |
5 Jun 1949 |
| Archbishop Julian Charles Porteous | Archbishop of Hobart, Australia |
12 Jun 1949 |
| Archbishop George Joseph Lucas | Archbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA |
14 Jun 1949 |
| Archbishop Malcolm Patrick McMahon, O.P. | Archbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain |
17 Jun 1949 |
| Bishop Frederick Joseph Colli | Bishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada |
19 Jun 1949 |
| Bishop Michael Richard Cote | Bishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA |
21 Jun 1949 |
| Archbishop Yousif Thomas Mirkis, O.P. | Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq |
27 Jun 1949 |
| Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal Kovithavanij | Archbishop of Bangkok, Thailand |
28 Jun 1949 |
| Bishop David Douglas Crosby, O.M.I. | Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada |
30 Jun 1949 |
| Bishop Franco Giulio Brambilla | Bishop of Novara, Italy |
1 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Maksymilian Leon Dubrawski, O.F.M. | Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine |
1 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Cornelius Piong | Bishop of Keningau, Malaysia |
3 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Bernardino Cruz Cortez | Prelate of Infanta, Philippines |
4 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Esmeraldo Barreto de Farias, Ist. del Prado | Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil |
4 Jul 1949 |
| Louis Raphaël I Cardinal Sako | Patriarch of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq |
7 Jul 1949 |
| Archbishop Franklyn (Frank) Atese Nubuasah, S.V.D. | Bishop of Gaborone, Botswana |
8 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Adriano Ciocca Vasino | Prelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil |
10 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Alexander Pyone Cho | Bishop of Pyay, Myanmar |
17 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Paul Bernard Bird, C.SS.R. | Bishop of Ballarat, Australia |
24 Jul 1949 |
| Archbishop Marek Jędraszewski | Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland |
24 Jul 1949 |
| Archbishop Joan Enric Vives Sicilia | Bishop of Urgell, Spain |
26 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Musie Ghebreghiorghis, O.F.M. Cap. | Bishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
29 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Bernardo Álvarez Afonso | Bishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain |
31 Jul 1949 |
| Bishop Rafael Zornoza Boy | Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain |
1 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Terence Patrick Drainey | Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain |
1 Aug 1949 |
| Archbishop Bruno Forte | Archbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy |
2 Aug 1949 |
| Archbishop Vasyl Semeniuk | Archbishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
3 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Camillus Archibong Etokudoh | Bishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria |
6 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Noel Antonio Londoño Buitrago, C.SS.R. | Bishop of Jericó, Colombia |
6 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Clarence Richard Silva | Bishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA |
9 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Markus Büchel | Bishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland |
9 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Glen John Provost | Bishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA |
15 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop José de Jesús Quintero Díaz | Vicar Apostolic of Leticia, Colombia |
17 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop José João dos Santos Marcos | Bishop of Beja, Portugal |
19 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Stephan Meniok, C.SS.R. | Archiepiscopal Exarch of Donets’k (Ukrainian), Ukraine |
19 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Giovanni Roncari, O.F.M. Cap. | Bishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy |
23 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop William Michael Mulvey | Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA |
25 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Diómedes Espinal de León | Bishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic |
27 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Manuel Neto Quintas, S.C.I. | Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal |
30 Aug 1949 |
| Bishop Norbert Marshall Andradi, O.M.I. | Bishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka |
4 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Pedro Pablo Elizondo Cárdenas, L.C. | Bishop of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México |
4 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop David Allen Zubik | Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA |
9 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Henry D’Souza | Bishop of Bellary, India |
11 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Gianfranco De Luca | Bishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy |
17 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Gorgônio Alves da Encarnação Neto, C.R. | Bishop of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo, Brazil |
21 Sep 1949 |
| Odilo Pedro Cardinal Scherer | Archbishop of São Paulo, Brazil |
23 Sep 1949 |
| Archbishop Giovanni Paolo Benotto | Archbishop of Pisa, Italy |
23 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Anthony Ireri Mukobo, I.M.C. | Bishop of Isiolo, Kenya |
23 Sep 1949 |
| Bishop Aleksander Kaszkiewicz | Bishop of Grodno, Belarus |
24 Sep 1949 |
| Anders Cardinal Arborelius, O.C.D. | Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden |
29 Sep 1949 |
| Archbishop Gabriel ’Leke Abegunrin | Archbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria |
1 Oct 1949 |
| Archbishop Antony Pappusamy | Archbishop of Madurai, India |
5 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop Douglas Regattieri | Bishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy |
10 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop Pedro José Conti | Bishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil |
13 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop Edoardo Aldo Cerrato, C.O. | Bishop of Ivrea, Italy |
18 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop José Manuel Lorca Planes | Bishop of Cartagena (en España) |
19 Oct 1949 |
| Archbishop Stanisław Gądecki | Archbishop of Poznań, Poland |
20 Oct 1949 |
| James Michael Cardinal Harvey | Archpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica} |
22 Oct 1949 |
| Archbishop Agustinus Agus | Archbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia |
23 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop James Anthony Tamayo | Bishop of Laredo, Texas, USA |
27 Oct 1949 |
| Bishop Javier Navarro Rodríguez | Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México |
30 Oct 1949 |
| Archbishop Paul Tschang In-Nam | Apostolic Nuncio to Netherlands |
3 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Josep Maria Abella Batlle, C.M.F. | Bishop of Fukuoka, Japan |
6 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Freddy Jesús Fuenmayor Suárez | Bishop of Los Teques, Venezuela |
8 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Antoine Nabil Andari | Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon |
9 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop David Dennis Kagan | Bishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA |
12 Nov 1949 |
| Archbishop Gregory Michael Aymond | Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA |
12 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Gerald Isaac Lobo | Bishop of Udupi, India |
14 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Gerardo Rocconi | Bishop of Jesi, Italy |
15 Nov 1949 |
| Arlindo Cardinal Gomes Furtado | Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde |
17 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Héctor Cubillos Peña | Bishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia |
21 Nov 1949 |
| Archbishop Juan Alberto Puiggari | Archbishop of Paraná, Argentina |
22 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop Mario Espinosa Contreras | Bishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México |
22 Nov 1949 |
| Archbishop Joseph Nguyễn Chí Linh | Archbishop of Huế, Viet Nam |
1 Dec 1949 |
| Bishop Quesnel Alphonse, S.M.M. | Bishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti |
2 Dec 1949 |
| Bishop Peter Parapullil | Bishop of Jhansi, India |
7 Dec 1949 |
| Bishop Eugenijus Bartulis | Bishop of Šiauliai, Lithuania |
7 Dec 1949 |
| Bishop John Anthony Boissonneau | Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada |