Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-René de La Roche de Fontenille

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1699¹BornParis
30 Aug 173738.6SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
16 Dec 173738.9ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
12 Jan 173839.0Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
7 Jan 175960.0DiedBishop of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-René de La Roche de Fontenille:
Bishop Antoine-René de La Roche de Fontenille (born 1699, died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015