Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Hyacinthe-Jean Feutrier

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1785BornParis
27 May 180924.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182539.8SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
21 Mar 182539.9ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Apr 182540.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
27 Jun 183045.2DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for François-Hyacinthe-Jean Feutrier (VIAF: 220828752)
Bishop François-Hyacinthe-Jean Feutrier (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a priest for 21.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016