Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Paul Pontier

Archbishop of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1943 BornLavaur
3 Jul 196623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
2 Feb 198844.8AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
20 Mar 198844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
5 Aug 199653.3AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
12 May 200663.0AppointedArchbishop of Marseille, France
11 Jun 200663.1InstalledArchbishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Paul Pontier:
Archbishop Georges Paul Pontier (born ) Archbishop of Marseille

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Marseille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,533
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014