Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles de Machault

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1737BornParis
16 Oct 177133.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Amiens, France
27 Jan 177234.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Amiens, France
27 Jan 177234.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
15 Mar 177234.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
10 Jul 177436.5SucceededBishop of Amiens, France
6 Nov 180163.8ResignedBishop of Amiens, France
12 Jul 182082.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles de Machault
Bishop Louis-Charles de Machault (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amiens

  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79, and Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016