Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Pingré

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹Born
28 Feb 165844.1SelectedBishop of Toulon, France
17 Jun 165844.4ConfirmedBishop of Toulon, France
12 Jan 165945.0Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
5 Dec 166248.9DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Pingré
Bishop Pierre Pingré (born 1614, died ) Bishop of Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast