Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Marie Jean Rey, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1952 Born
4 Dec 198331.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
23 Jun 198431.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
16 May 200047.6AppointedBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
17 Sep 200047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique Marie Jean Rey (VIAF: 56786367)
Bishop Dominique Marie Jean Rey Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Fréjus-Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Étienne, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained DeaconSt-Odile, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopOpen Air, in the park, La Castille, Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fréjus-Toulon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,839
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: AJ, 8 Mar 2017
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast