Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Antonio Tobón Restrepo

Archbishop of Medellín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1951 BornItuango
21 Nov 197524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
25 Apr 200352.0AppointedBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
14 Jun 200352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
16 Feb 201058.8AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
8 May 201059.0InstalledArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Antonio Tobón Restrepo:
Archbishop Ricardo Antonio Tobón Restrepo (born ) Archbishop of Medellín

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Medellín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,410

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014